Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Skipsfører / Hvalfanger | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 7/1/1957 | |
Norway | 1. Styrmann / Telegrafist | Unknown | 8/23/1960 | Unknown | 5/1/1961 | |
Norway | Unknown | 8/30/1957 | Unknown | 9/29/1957 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Tønsberg, Norge | 8/7/1956 | Tønsberg, Norge | 5/8/1957 | |
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Tønsberg, Norge | 8/26/1954 | Tønsberg, Norge | 5/9/1956 | |
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Tønsberg, Norge | 6/5/1953 | Tønsberg, Norge | 5/22/1954 |