Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Maskinist | Unknown | Unknown | Om bord pr. | 1941 | |
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Om bord pr. | 1941 | ||
Norway | Styrmann | Unknown | Unknown | Om bord pr. | 1941 | |
Norway | Maskinassistent | Unknown | Unknown | Om bord pr. | 1941 | |
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 3/18/1943 | Unknown | 10/20/1945 | |
Norway | Om bord pr. | 10/4/1941 | Om bord pr. | 11/29/1941 | ||
Norway | Bergen, Norge | 7/1941 | Lerwick, Shetland. | 11/29/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 9/17/1940 | Unknown | 5/10/1941 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 8/22/1940 | Unknown | 9/14/1940 | |
Norway | Norge | 7/11/1940 | Lerwick, Shetland. | 12/12/1941 |