Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 8/23/1960 | Unknown | 4/22/1961 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 4/28/1959 | Unknown | 7/5/1960 | |
Norway | Maskinist | Unknown | 11/20/1957 | Unknown | 1/31/1959 | |
Norway | Kristiansund, Norge | 1/26/1956 | Trondheim, Norge | 4/19/1956 | ||
Norway | Maskinist | Oslo, Norge | 6/10/1943 | Trondheim, Norge | 5/7/1945 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 8/4/1928 | Oslo, Norge | 3/20/1939 |