Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 9/22/1885 | Forlist | 11/16/1885 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 9/22/1885 | Risør, Norge | 11/16/1885 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 9/22/1885 | Risør, Norge | 3/23/1886 | |
Norway | Førstereisgutt | Risør, Norge | 9/22/1885 | Forlist | 11/16/1885 | |
Norway | Brevik, Norge | 7/21/1884 | Newport, Monmouthshire, UK | 5/23/1885 | ||
Norway | Førstereisgutt | Risør, Norge | 6/17/1884 | Risør, Norge | 10/2/1884 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 4/16/1884 | Risør, Norge | 6/17/1884 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 4/16/1884 | Forlist | Unknown | |
Norway | Lettmatros / Matros | Risør, Norge | 4/16/1884 | Risør, Norge | 9/21/1885 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 12/20/1883 | Le Havre, Frankrike | 2/16/1884 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 1/4/1883 | Risør, Norge | 9/21/1885 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 1/4/1883 | Rømt fra skipet. | 9/3/1883 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 1/4/1883 | Risør, Norge | 3/18/1884 |