Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 3/1/1869 | Forlist | 11/20/1869 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/1/1869 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/1/1869 | Forlist | Unknown | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 8/20/1868 | Forlist | 10/20/1869 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/28/1868 | Unknown | 5/29/1869 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 2/28/1868 | Forlist | 10/10/1869 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/28/1868 | Risør, Norge | 2/6/1869 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/28/1868 | Risør, Norge | 9/20/1869 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 2/28/1868 | Risør, Norge | 2/6/1869 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/28/1868 | Risør, Norge | 4/28/1868 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/22/1868 | Risør, Norge | 2/6/1869 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 8/25/1867 | Risør, Norge | 11/13/1867 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 8/24/1867 | Risør, Norge | 11/13/1867 | |
Norway | Styrmann | Risør, Norge | 8/24/1867 | Risør, Norge | 11/13/1867 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/25/1867 | Risør, Norge | 4/23/1867 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/25/1867 | Risør, Norge | 8/24/1867 | |
Norway | Styrmann / Skipsfører | Risør, Norge | 2/25/1867 | Risør, Norge | 6/18/1869 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/25/1867 | Risør, Norge | 11/13/1867 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/23/1866 | Risør, Norge | 9/3/1866 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/23/1866 | Risør, Norge | 9/3/1866 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 3/23/1866 | Risør, Norge | 9/3/1866 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 11/16/1865 | Risør, Norge | 9/3/1866 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 3/6/1865 | Risør, Norge | 10/27/1865 | ||
Norway | Lettmatros til Matros | Risør, Norge | 3/6/1865 | Risør, Norge | 9/3/1866 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/6/1865 | Risør, Norge | 10/24/1865 |