Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 3/30/1998 | Unknown | 4/8/1998 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/27/1997 | Unknown | 2/19/1997 | ||
Norway | Cadiz, Spania | 7/28/1995 | Unknown | 9/2/1999 | ||
Norway | Trieste, Italia | 3/2/1992 | Port of Sarroc, Sardinia, Italia | 2/12/1995 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 12/20/1991 | Unknown | 2/19/1992 | ||
Norway | Inspektør / Skipsfører | Unknown | 10/27/1991 | Unknown | 12/19/1991 | |
Norway | Inspektør / Skipsfører | Unknown | 6/16/1991 | Unknown | 9/4/1991 |