Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 9/5/1873 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 4/29/1873 | Risør, Norge | 5/26/1873 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 4/29/1873 | Risør, Norge | 8/16/1873 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 10/2/1872 | Risør, Norge | 12/17/1872 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 10/2/1872 | Risør, Norge | 12/17/1872 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 4/17/1872 | Risør, Norge | 9/12/1872 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 4/16/1872 | Risør, Norge | 12/17/1872 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 8/18/1871 | Risør, Norge | 12/22/1871 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/26/1871 | Risør, Norge | 10/12/1871 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 4/26/1870 | Risør, Norge | 11/4/1870 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 4/26/1870 | Risør, Norge | 11/4/1870 | |
Norway | Fredrikstad, Norge | 10/5/1869 | Unknown | 8/17/1870 | ||
Norway | Matros til 1. styrmann | Fredrikstad, Norge | 10/5/1869 | Kragerø, Norge | 11/2/1871 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 9/30/1869 | Risør, Norge | 11/23/1869 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Kragerø, Norge | 6/26/1869 | Kragerø, Norge | 8/10/1869 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 5/15/1868 | Risør, Norge | 5/24/1870 | ||
Norway | Styrmann | Risør, Norge | 4/25/1866 | Risør, Norge | 8/21/1868 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 4/10/1865 | Risør, Norge | 11/22/1865 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/21/1864 | Risør, Norge | 5/21/1864 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 12/3/1863 | Risør, Norge | 2/2/1864 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 8/29/1863 | Risør, Norge | 10/30/1863 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/23/1863 | Risør, Norge | 10/30/1863 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 5/7/1862 | Risør, Norge | 6/26/1862 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 5/7/1862 | Risør, Norge | 12/19/1862 |