Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 11/3/1963 | London, UK | 3/24/1964 | ||
Norway | Kokk / Stuert | Unknown | 9/26/1957 | Unknown | 12/22/1958 | |
Norway | Maskinassistent | Unknown | 3/18/1957 | Unknown | 8/21/1957 | |
Norway | Unknown | 2/7/1957 | Unknown | 4/29/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 11/21/1956 | Unknown | 2/7/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/19/1956 | Unknown | 9/10/1956 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 11/3/1955 | Unknown | 11/21/1956 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/3/1954 | Unknown | 6/8/1955 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Unknown | 1/2/1954 | Unknown | 10/20/1954 | |
Norway | Unknown | 6/8/1953 | Unknown | 1/2/1954 |