Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | 1.Styrmann til Skipsfører | Tvedestrand, Norge | 12/23/1887 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 3/12/1889 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Tvedestrand, Norge | 12/23/1887 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 3/12/1889 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Tvedestrand, Norge | 4/1/1886 | England | 7/2/1886 | |
Norway | Antwerpen, Belgia | 5/29/1879 | Kristiania / Oslo, Norge | 10/21/1880 | ||
Norway | Tvedestrand, Norge | 6/20/1876 | Antwerpen, Belgia | 1/27/1879 |