Seafarer | Nationality | Position 🠗1 | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | Unknown | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | |
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 3/20/1956 | Trondheim, Norge | 5/2/1956 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 10/7/1951 | Trondheim, Norge | 1/5/1952 | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 8/26/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 2/12/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 1/22/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | 1. Styrmann / Telegrafist | Ålesund, Norge | 5/7/1949 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Om bord pr. | 3/14/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 8/26/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 1/13/1951 | Tromsø, Norge | 10/7/1951 | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 2/12/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 1/22/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 5/17/1942 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 6/26/1941 | Kristiansand, Norge | 3/31/1942 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 5/18/1937 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 7/30/1938 | Trondheim, Norge | 9/10/1938 | ||
Norway | Tromsø, Norge | 9/28/1940 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/30/1937 | Unknown | 12/19/1937 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 9/27/1935 | Trondheim, Norge | 1/25/1936 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/21/1935 | Unknown | 6/23/1935 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 8/13/1933 | Trondheim, Norge | 7/26/1934 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/16/1952 | Unknown | 1/8/1953 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 6/28/1948 | London, UK | 7/20/1948 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 9/27/1923 | Trondheim, Norge | 3/8/1924 | ||
Norway | Fyrbøter / Donkeymann | Trondheim, Norge | 3/13/1944 | Sarpsborg, Norge | 10/20/1944 |