Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Norway | Tromsø, Norge | 12/19/1943 | Bergen, Norge | 9/5/1944 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | Unknown | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | |
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 2/22/1945 | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 1/26/1945 | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 1/26/1945 | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 1/25/1945 | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 6/26/1941 | Kristiansand, Norge | 3/31/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 6/28/1948 | London, UK | 7/20/1948 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 6/21/1936 | Newcastle, UK | 1/13/1938 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Oslo, Norge | 9/9/1943 | Oslo, Norge | 3/29/1944 | |
Norway | Harstad, Norge | 1/27/1943 | Oslo, Norge | 2/15/1944 | ||
Norway | Fyrbøter / Donkeymann | Trondheim, Norge | 3/13/1944 | Sarpsborg, Norge | 10/20/1944 | |
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 9/2/1959 | Stavanger, Norge | 1/19/1960 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 1/13/1951 | Tromsø, Norge | 10/7/1951 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 3/20/1956 | Trondheim, Norge | 5/2/1956 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 11/11/1954 | Trondheim, Norge | 7/5/1957 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 10/7/1951 | Trondheim, Norge | 1/5/1952 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 12/5/1950 | Trondheim, Norge | 2/7/1951 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 2/16/1944 | Trondheim, Norge | 1/25/1945 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 7/30/1938 | Trondheim, Norge | 9/10/1938 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 9/29/1935 | Trondheim, Norge | 1/25/1936 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 9/27/1935 | Trondheim, Norge | 1/25/1936 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 8/13/1933 | Trondheim, Norge | 7/26/1934 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 9/27/1923 | Trondheim, Norge | 3/8/1924 | ||
Norway | Lemper | Trondheim, Norge | 4/24/1923 | Trondheim, Norge | 9/27/1923 |