Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | Unknown | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | |
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 9/2/1959 | Stavanger, Norge | 1/19/1960 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 3/20/1956 | Trondheim, Norge | 5/2/1956 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 11/11/1954 | Trondheim, Norge | 7/5/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 2/22/1954 | Unknown | 11/10/1954 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/16/1952 | Unknown | 1/8/1953 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 10/7/1951 | Trondheim, Norge | 1/5/1952 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 1/13/1951 | Tromsø, Norge | 10/7/1951 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 12/5/1950 | Trondheim, Norge | 2/7/1951 | ||
Norway | 1. Styrmann / Telegrafist | Ålesund, Norge | 5/7/1949 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | London, UK | 6/28/1948 | London, UK | 7/20/1948 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 9/9/1947 | Unknown | 8/24/1948 | |
Norway | Kullemper | Unknown | 5/31/1945 | Unknown | 9/15/1945 | |
Norway | Om bord pr. | 3/14/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 3/14/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 2/22/1945 | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 1/26/1945 | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 1/26/1945 | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 1/25/1945 | Beskutt av skip/ubåt/land | 3/30/1945 | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 8/26/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 8/26/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 8/26/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 8/26/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Maskinmester | Om bord pr. | 8/26/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Fyrbøter / Donkeymann | Trondheim, Norge | 3/13/1944 | Sarpsborg, Norge | 10/20/1944 |