Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Risør, Norge | 11/12/1984 | Risør, Norge | 2/11/1985 | |
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Risør, Norge | 8/17/1984 | Risør, Norge | 9/23/1984 | |
Norway | Grimstad, Norge | 10/4/1980 | Great Yarmouth, England, UK | 11/4/1980 | ||
Norway | Lillesand, Norge | 12/12/1979 | Lillesand, Norge | 7/20/1981 | ||
Norway | Grimstad f. utlandet | 3/23/1979 | Unknown | 10/18/1981 |