The information on registered seafarers is not in all cases complete. As new sources are studied, information on engagements and medals etc. will be added to some of the already registered seafarers.
Fikk styrmannspatent 04.06.1881 og skipperpatent 04.11.1897.
Orlogstjeneste i tiden 27.04.1891 til 18.07.1891.
Døde ved drukning i dokken i Leith i april 1911.