The information on registered seafarers is not in all cases complete. As new sources are studied, information on engagements and medals etc. will be added to some of the already registered seafarers.
Orlogstjeneste 15.05.1894 til 25.08.1894 Carl Johans Værn.
Mønstret matros på "Levante" i Christiania 09.03.1899,mønstret av i Oscarshamn 20-12-1899.
Fikk styrmannspatent 29.12.1899 og skipperpatent 07.07.1902 og nytt 21.03.1908.
Mønstret 1.styrmann på "Clarente" i Christiania 25.04.1904, mønstret av i Christiania 23.04.1905.
Forliste med "Leidi" 25.04.1907.