Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Unknown | Unknown | Haifa, Israel | 10/14/1943 | |||
Palestine Mandate | Unknown | Unknown | Haifa, Israel | 10/14/1943 | ||
Denmark | Alexandria, Egypt | 6/8/1944 | Haifa, Israel | 6/29/1944 | ||
Palestine Mandate | Haifa, Israel | 2/5/1944 | Haifa, Israel | 6/14/1944 | ||
Norway | Alexandria, Egypt | 1/28/1944 | Haifa, Israel | 6/29/1944 | ||
Palestine Mandate | Haifa, Israel | 11/16/1943 | Haifa, Israel | 1/31/1944 | ||
Palestine Mandate | Haifa, Israel | 10/15/1943 | Haifa, Israel | 11/16/1943 | ||
Somalia | Port Said, Egypt | 8/21/1943 | Haifa, Israel | 9/4/1943 | ||
Haifa, Israel | 5/11/1943 | Haifa, Israel | 9/14/1943 | |||
Denmark | San Pedro, CA, USA | 12/3/1942 | Haifa, Israel | 6/10/1943 | ||
Norway | Hamburg, Tyskland | 5/1/1932 | Hamburg, Tyskland | 8/30/1934 | ||
Norway | Hamburg, Tyskland | 2/19/1932 | Hamburg, Tyskland | 5/1/1932 | ||
Norway | Sarpsborg, Norge | 4/27/1939 | Haugesund, Norge | 10/2/1939 | ||
Norway | San Pedro, CA, USA | 8/19/1942 | La Valetta, Malta | 7/1/1943 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 6/24/1932 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 12/22/1932 | ||
Norway | Kiel, Tyskland | 6/1/1961 | London, UK | 10/24/1962 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 7/2/1946 | London, UK | 10/10/1946 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 4/13/1946 | London, UK | 10/15/1946 | |
Norway | Baltimore, MD, USA | 5/5/1945 | London, UK | 6/18/1945 | ||
Norway | Baltimore, MD, USA | 5/4/1945 | London, UK | 6/19/1945 | ||
Norway | Rotterdam, Holland | 7/6/1946 | Malmø, Sverige | 6/9/1948 | ||
Norway | Auckland, New Zealand | 7/14/1942 | Marseille, Frankrike | 10/23/1944 | ||
Norway | Sarpsborg, Norge | 3/8/1941 | Narvik, Norge | 7/9/1941 | ||
Norway | Maskinassistent | New York, NY, USA | 8/24/1945 | New York, NY, USA | 9/2/1945 | |
Australia | New York, NY, USA | 7/23/1945 | New York, NY, USA | 7/29/1945 |