Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 9/4/1945 | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 10/2/1944 | |
Norway | U. Kv. M. (Utskrevet Kvartermester) | Unknown | 3/8/1945 | Unknown | 1/31/1947 | |
Norway | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 10/31/1945 | ||
Norway | Sjef (Marinen) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 3/15/1945 | |
Norway | Kvm. (M). II. kl. (Kvartermester maskin 2. klasse) | Unknown | 1/5/1945 | Unknown | 3/19/1945 | |
Norway | Kokk | Unknown | 9/4/1945 | Unknown | 12/8/1945 | |
Norway | Kokk | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 12/14/1944 | |
Norway | Elektromatros | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 1/4/1945 |