Seafarer 🠗1 | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 9/4/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 11/14/1946 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 10/31/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 12/9/1945 | Unknown | 6/17/1946 | |
Norway | U. Kv. M. (Utskrevet Kvartermester) | Unknown | 3/8/1945 | Unknown | 1/31/1947 | |
Norway | Sjef (Marinen) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 3/15/1945 | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 10/2/1944 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 12/13/1944 | Unknown | 12/18/1944 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 8/10/1945 | Unknown | 2/21/1946 |