Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Norway | U. m. m. (Utskrevet maskinmann) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 11/30/1945 | |
Norway | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 10/31/1945 | ||
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 9/24/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 1/9/1946 | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 9/4/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 11/14/1946 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 10/31/1945 | |
Norway | Sjef (Marinen) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 3/15/1945 | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 7/27/1944 | Unknown | 10/2/1944 |