Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 5/5/1947 | |
Norway | Maskinmester | Unknown | 2/27/1955 | Unknown | 5/3/1955 | |
Norway | Intendant | Unknown | 5/21/1954 | Unknown | 1/26/1955 | |
Norway | Nestkommanderende | Unknown | 12/8/1950 | Unknown | 9/30/1951 | |
Norway | Skipsoffiser (Marinen) | Unknown | 4/21/1948 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Offiser | Unknown | 10/12/1946 | Unknown | 11/1/1946 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 6/25/1945 | Unknown | 1/4/1947 |