Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date 🠗1 | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Signalmann | Unknown | 3/15/1945 | Unknown | 5/12/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/22/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | U. m. m. (Utskrevet maskinmann) | Unknown | 3/22/1945 | Unknown | 11/29/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/22/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/22/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/22/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 3/22/1945 | Unknown | 7/1/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/22/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/22/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 3/26/1945 | Unknown | 5/14/1946 | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 4/16/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Utskrevet Fenrik | Unknown | 4/16/1945 | Unknown | 5/7/1945 | |
Norway | U. m. m. (Utskrevet maskinmann) | Unknown | 4/16/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Minemannskap | Unknown | 4/16/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/10/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Nestkommanderende | Unknown | 5/12/1945 | Unknown | 5/17/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/14/1945 | Unknown | 5/31/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/14/1945 | Unknown | 5/24/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/14/1945 | Dimittert (Marinen) | 9/14/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/18/1945 | Unknown | 5/22/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 6/26/1945 | Unknown | 6/13/1946 | |
Norway | Sjef (Marinen) | Unknown | 12/17/1945 | Unknown | 2/3/1947 | |
Norway | Skipssjef | Unknown | 1945 | Unknown | 12/25/1945 | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 1/2/1946 | Unknown | 4/12/1946 |