Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date 🠗1 | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 1/15/1931 | Bristol, UK | Unknown | ||
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 7/31/1939 | Haugesund, Norge | 10/5/1939 | ||
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 8/23/1939 | Haugesund, Norge | 1/10/1940 | ||
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 10/14/1939 | Haugesund, Norge | 12/29/1939 | ||
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 10/14/1939 | Glasgow, UK | 3/1/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Haugesund, Norge | 1/10/1940 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 2/29/1940 | Unknown | 8/20/1940 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 2/29/1940 | Preston, UK | 11/28/1940 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 2/1940 | Preston, UK | 11/28/1940 | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 2/1940 | Hull, Yorkshire, UK | 8/20/1940 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Trondheim, Norge | 2/1940 | Hull, Yorkshire, UK | 8/20/1940 | |
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 3/1/1940 | Hull, Yorkshire, UK | 8/20/1940 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Om bord pr. | 7/1/1940 | Unknown | 8/20/1940 | |
Norway | ukjent | Om bord pr. | 7/1/1940 | Unknown | 8/26/1940 | |
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 8/15/1940 | Unknown | 3/16/1941 | ||
Norway | Maskinist | Unknown | 8/22/1940 | Preston, UK | 11/27/1940 | |
Norway | Hull, Yorkshire, UK | 8/23/1940 | Preston, UK | 11/28/1940 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 8/23/1940 | Glasgow, UK | 2/22/1941 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/24/1940 | Unknown | 10/1940 | ||
Norway | Hull, Yorkshire, UK | 8/26/1940 | Preston, UK | 11/27/1940 | ||
Denmark | Unknown | 9/1940 | Unknown | 10/1940 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 11/22/1940 | Omkom ved torpedering | 9/7/1941 | |
Norway | Unknown | 11/26/1940 | Unknown | 3/18/1941 | ||
Norway | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 11/26/1940 | Plymouth, Devon, UK | 1/2/1941 | ||
Norway | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 11/28/1940 | Omkom ved torpedering | 9/7/1941 |