Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 9/21/1946 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 9/21/1946 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 9/21/1946 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 9/3/1946 | Rotterdam, Holland | 8/6/1947 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Oslo, Norge | 4/5/1946 | Newcastle, UK | 3/9/1948 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/7/1940 | Unknown | 7/19/1940 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 12/29/1939 | Massawa, Eritrea | 8/3/1941 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 12/21/1939 | Greenock, UK | 9/27/1940 | ||
Norway | 3. Maskinist til 2. Maskinist | Oslo, Norge | 10/14/1939 | New York, NY, USA | 4/6/1943 | |
Norway | Matros / Båtsmann | Oslo, Norge | 8/1/1939 | Manchester, UK | 6/23/1945 | |
Norway | Kokk | Oslo, Norge | 5/30/1939 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 10/31/1940 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/31/1937 | Rotterdam, Holland | 4/26/1937 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/15/1935 | Unknown | 10/19/1935 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/8/1935 | Grangemouth, UK | 6/17/1936 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 11/26/1934 | Oslo, Norge | 3/15/1935 | ||
Norway | 1. Styrmann / Telegrafist | Oslo, Norge | 9/26/1933 | Grangemouth, UK | 6/17/1936 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 9/26/1933 | Grangemouth, UK | 6/17/1936 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 9/26/1933 | Antwerpen, Belgia | 7/23/1934 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 8/1/1932 | Oslo, Norge | 8/25/1933 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 8/1/1932 | Amsterdam, Nederland | 2/25/1933 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 10/31/1944 | New York, NY, USA | 5/7/1945 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Ommønstring | 11/1/1941 | Suez, Egypt | 6/1/1942 | |
Norway | ukjent | Om bord pr. | 1939 | Antwerpen, Belgia | 10/1939 | |
Norway | Norfolk, VA, USA | 4/3/1943 | Norfolk, VA, USA | 8/15/1943 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Newcastle, UK | 5/31/1945 | Southampton, UK | 4/17/1946 |