Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 4/9/1940 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 5/21/1939 | Torpedert | 2/5/1943 | ||
Norway | 3. Styrmann / Telegrafist | Haugesund, Norge | 7/23/1938 | Torpedert | 2/5/1943 | |
Norway | Shanghai, Kina | 4/19/1938 | Unknown | 1/7/1941 | ||
Norway | Hong Kong | 11/9/1937 | Torpedert | 2/5/1943 | ||
Norway | Hong Kong | 5/11/1931 | Guangzhou, Kina | 4/15/1932 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Haugesund, Norge | 11/6/1930 | Torpedert | 2/5/1943 | |
Norway | Unknown | 1/8/1926 | Unknown | 7/19/1926 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 10/28/1922 | Unknown | 5/24/1923 |