Seafarer | Nationality 🠗1 | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 5/23/1967 | Oslo, Norge | 8/21/1967 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 4/12/1966 | Oslo, Norge | 9/27/1966 | ||
Norway | Stavanger, Norge | 9/27/1965 | Oslo, Norge | 11/9/1965 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 2/16/1965 | Oslo, Norge | 9/3/1965 | ||
Norway | Gjeving, Norge | 5/8/1964 | Arendal, Norge | 5/20/1964 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/13/1963 | Oslo, Norge | 9/29/1964 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 11/24/1961 | Drammen, Norge | 12/29/1962 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 10/20/1959 | Unknown | 5/16/1960 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 7/30/1959 | Unknown | 10/20/1959 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/9/1959 | Oslo, Norge | 1/14/1961 | ||
Norway | Rotterdam, Holland | 7/8/1958 | Oslo, Norge | 11/24/1958 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/1/1958 | Unknown | 6/20/1959 | ||
Norway | Sarpsborg, Norge | 6/12/1964 | Oslo, Norge | 6/3/1965 |