Seafarer | Nationality | Position 🠗1 | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | København, Danmark | 1/1/1959 | Bremen, Tyskland | 5/14/1961 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/20/1962 | Hamburg, Tyskland | 3/15/1963 | ||
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Farsund, Norge | 12/1/1973 | Hakata, Japan | 12/4/1974 |