Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Torpedooffiser | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Torpedomatros | Unknown | 12/11/1960 | Unknown | 3/16/1961 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 1/16/1945 | Unknown | 1/26/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/14/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Navigasjonsoffiser (Nav. Off.) | Unknown | 1/3/1943 | Unknown | 4/1/1944 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 11/1/1945 | |
Norway | A. S. D. Operatør | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 11/1/1945 | |
Norway | U. m. m. (Utskrevet maskinmann) | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 11/1/1945 | |
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 11/30/1944 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 7/4/1946 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 11/1/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 1/8/1947 | |
Norway | Kokk | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 7/31/1943 | |
Norway | Matros (T) II kl. | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 5/19/1946 | |
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 7/31/1943 | ||
Norway | Asdic operatør | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/20/1954 | Unknown | 1/14/1955 | |
Norway | Fenrik | Unknown | 7/3/1947 | Unknown | 9/30/1947 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 10/21/1946 | Unknown | 1/13/1947 | |
Norway | Kvm. II kl. | Unknown | 10/21/1946 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Unknown | 3/16/1946 | Unknown | 7/4/1946 | ||
Norway | Løytnant | Unknown | 9/30/1945 | Unknown | 5/14/1946 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 8/25/1945 | Unknown | 10/13/1945 |