Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Asdic operatør | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Torpedooffiser | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Kvm. II kl. | Unknown | 10/21/1946 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Skipsoffiser (Marinen) | Unknown | 3/20/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Fenrik | Unknown | 10/27/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | U. m. m. (Utskrevet maskinmann) | Unknown | 9/21/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 9/21/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 8/15/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | U. m. m. (Utskrevet maskinmann) | Unknown | 4/30/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Asdic | Unknown | 2/4/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | S. D. og synkeminemannskap | Unknown | 1/14/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Unknown | 7/31/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/14/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 4/19/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/29/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Kokk | Unknown | 3/5/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Unknown | 3/1/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/1/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Unknown | 2/18/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Kvm. (M) (Kvartermester maskin) | Unknown | 7/31/1941 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Torpedomatros | Unknown | 12/11/1960 | Unknown | 3/16/1961 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/20/1954 | Unknown | 1/14/1955 | |
Norway | Fenrik | Unknown | 7/3/1947 | Unknown | 9/30/1947 |