Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 11/29/1943 | Unknown | 5/22/1944 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/1/1943 | Unknown | 10/20/1944 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/1/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Skipssjef | Unknown | 1/1/1943 | Unknown | 3/10/1945 | |
Norway | Skipsoffiser (Marinen) | Unknown | 3/20/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Unknown | 3/1944 | Unknown | 5/1944 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 10/1943 | Unknown | 12/1943 | ||
Norway | S. D. og synkeminemannskap | Unknown | 1/14/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | S. D. Opr. (Marinen) | Unknown | 7/31/1943 | Unknown | 2/11/1944 | |
Norway | S. D. Opr. (Marinen) | Unknown | 3/17/1943 | Unknown | 12/31/1943 | |
Norway | Oppasser | Unknown | 12/20/1943 | Unknown | 11/30/1944 | |
Norway | Navigasjonsoffiser (Nav. Off.) | Unknown | 1/3/1943 | Unknown | 4/1/1944 | |
Norway | Unknown | 11/18/1944 | Unknown | 12/29/1945 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 4/30/1944 | Unknown | 2/8/1946 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/15/1943 | Unknown | 8/12/1943 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/1/1943 | Unknown | 7/15/1943 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/1/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Matros (T) II kl. | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | 5/19/1946 | |
Norway | Maskinist | Unknown | 1/1/1943 | Unknown | 7/4/1946 | |
Norway | Løytnant | Unknown | 9/30/1945 | Unknown | 5/14/1946 | |
Norway | Kvm. II kl. | Unknown | 10/21/1946 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Kvm. (M) (Kvartermester maskin) | Unknown | 7/31/1941 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Unknown | 3/16/1946 | Unknown | 7/4/1946 | ||
Norway | Kvartermester Kl. 1 | Unknown | 9/21/1944 | Unknown | 11/28/1944 | |
Norway | Kontormann | Unknown | 10/23/1943 | Unknown | 12/31/1945 |