Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | S. D. og synkeminemannskap | Unknown | 1/14/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Skipsoffiser (Marinen) | Unknown | 3/20/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Unknown | 3/1944 | Unknown | 5/1944 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 10/1943 | Unknown | 12/1943 | ||
Norway | Oppasser | Unknown | 12/20/1943 | Unknown | 11/30/1944 | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 1/4/1943 | Unknown | 7/4/1946 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 7/31/1943 | Unknown | 4/30/1947 | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 4/19/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Unknown | 10/23/1944 | Unknown | 7/4/1946 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 11/29/1943 | Unknown | 5/22/1944 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/1/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Torpedooffiser | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 3/27/1944 | Unknown | 8/8/1944 | |
Norway | Asdic operatør | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 8/15/1944 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 4/19/1943 | Unknown | 4/30/1943 | |
Norway | Torpedomatros | Unknown | 12/11/1960 | Unknown | 3/16/1961 | |
Norway | Skipssjef | Unknown | 1/1/1943 | Unknown | 3/10/1945 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/14/1943 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 11/25/1944 | Unknown | 3/20/1945 | |
Norway | Kadett 3. klasse | Unknown | 9/1/1944 | Unknown | 9/10/1944 | |
Norway | U. d. m. (Utskrevet dekksmann) | Unknown | 3/31/1943 | Unknown | 10/29/1943 | |
Norway | Kvm. II kl. | Unknown | 10/21/1946 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 1/16/1945 | Unknown | 1/26/1945 |