Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Nestkommanderende | Unknown | 7/28/1941 | Unknown | 9/29/1941 | |
Norway | Maskinist | Unknown | 12/31/1941 | Unknown | 6/22/1942 | |
Norway | Maskinist | Unknown | 11/3/1941 | Unknown | 1/3/1942 | |
Norway | Kvm.(A, kvartermester II kl.) | Unknown | 10/1/1941 | Unknown | 11/10/1941 | |
Norway | Kvm. (T) II. klasse | Unknown | 8/2/1941 | Unknown | 9/3/1941 | |
Norway | Kokk | Unknown | 1/14/1942 | Unknown | 7/16/1942 | |
Norway | Art. Matr. II. Kl. (M. II. kl. (A)) (Artillerimatros) | Unknown | 10/1/1941 | Unknown | 11/10/1941 | |
Norway | Art. Matr. II. Kl. (M. II. kl. (A)) (Artillerimatros) | Unknown | 8/19/1941 | Unknown | 9/1/1941 |