Seafarer | Nationality | Position 🠗1 | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | 2. Maskinist til 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 11/12/1953 | Unknown | 3/30/1961 | |
Norway | Unknown | 10/6/1956 | Unknown | 10/30/1957 | ||
Norway | Sandefjord, Norge | 1/13/1955 | København, Danmark | 2/25/1956 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 12/1/1959 | Unknown | 3/31/1961 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 11/10/1956 | Unknown | 7/8/1959 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/21/1953 | Unknown | 5/16/1956 |