Seafarer | Nationality | Position 🠗1 | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 4/11/1950 | Unknown | 1/6/1951 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/3/1950 | Unknown | 5/27/1951 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 11/25/1948 | Unknown | 12/30/1948 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/28/1948 | Unknown | 6/29/1948 | ||
Norway | La Specia, Italia | 12/23/1953 | Lisboa, Portugal | 5/5/1954 | ||
Norway | Skipselektriker | Oslo, Norge | 11/18/1948 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Unknown | 10/10/1949 | Unknown | 1950 | ||
Norway | Telegrafist / Sekretær | Unknown | 4/23/1951 | Unknown | 4/10/1952 | |
Norway | Telegrafist / Sekretær | Unknown | 4/11/1950 | Unknown | 4/23/1951 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/31/1949 | Unknown | 4/23/1949 |