Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 8/13/1956 | Unknown | 1/11/1957 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 4/4/1953 | Unknown | 3/10/1954 | |
Norway | Unknown | 5/25/1951 | Unknown | 10/25/1951 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 10/29/1948 | Unknown | 5/23/1950 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 12/23/1950 | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 5/26/1952 | ||
Norway | Tømmermann / Matros | Unknown | Unknown | Sauda, Norge | 3/23/1960 |