Seafarer | Nationality 🠗1 | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 2/23/1953 | Unknown | 9/9/1953 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 3/13/1952 | London, UK | 12/10/1952 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 4/26/1949 | Unknown | 6/13/1949 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/3/1947 | Unknown | 3/18/1947 | ||
Norway | Smører / Fyrbøter | Ommønstring | 5/23/1936 | Oslo, Norge | 4/15/1937 | |
Norway | Maskinassistent | Oslo, Norge | 1/14/1936 | Oslo, Norge | 5/25/1936 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 6/23/1926 | Oslo, Norge | 4/6/1927 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 12/10/1925 | Oslo, Norge | 6/22/1926 |