Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour 🠗1 | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 4/27/1970 | Kharg Island, Iran | 7/27/1970 | ||
Norway | Stavanger, Norge | 12/23/1972 | Singapore | 7/27/1973 | ||
Norway | Stavanger, Norge | 4/20/1972 | Ras Tanura, Saudi Arabia | 10/23/1972 | ||
Norway | Stavanger, Norge | 6/1/1971 | Dubai, De forente arabiske emirater | 12/10/1971 | ||
Norway | Stavanger, Norge | 1/1/1968 | Kuwait | 4/21/1969 |