Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date 🠗1 | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Kvm. (M). II. kl. (Kvartermester maskin 2. klasse) | Unknown | 10/26/1946 | Unknown | 2/10/1947 | |
Norway | Sjef (Marinen) | Unknown | 10/20/1947 | Unknown | 6/12/1948 | |
Norway | Fyrbøter 2. / II. klasse (marinen) | Unknown | 1/23/1948 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Lege | Unknown | 6/22/1952 | Unknown | 9/13/1952 | |
Norway | Offiser | Unknown | 10/20/1954 | Unknown | 12/1/1954 | |
Norway | U.L.M | Unknown | 1/1/1955 | Unknown | 10/1/1955 |