Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 5/18/1962 | Unknown | 10/2/1962 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/1/1957 | Unknown | 7/14/1958 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/1/1956 | Unknown | 6/18/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/5/1956 | Unknown | 6/27/1956 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/15/1955 | Unknown | 10/1/1955 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 7/30/1955 | Unknown | 10/1/1955 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/12/1955 | Unknown | 5/13/1955 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/30/1953 | Unknown | 12/21/1955 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 12/18/1951 | Unknown | 6/23/1952 | |
Norway | 1. Styrmann / Kaptein | Unknown | 1/22/1951 | Unknown | 9/28/1965 |