Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Grimstad, Norge | 4/28/1876 | Sundsvall, Sverige | 6/13/1876 | ||
Norway | Grimstad, Norge | 1859 | Lillesand, Norge | 11/8/1862 | ||
Norway | Styrmann til Skipsfører | Unknown | 1/10/1885 | Unknown | 3/10/1886 | |
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Kokk | Grimstad, Norge | 4/30/1864 | Grimstad, Norge | 12/19/1865 |