Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 3/7/1941 | Plymouth, Devon, UK | 10/1/1941 | ||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 2/28/1941 | London, UK | 7/7/1941 | ||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 2/19/1941 | Southend, UK | 7/7/1941 | ||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 2/17/1941 | London, UK | 7/7/1941 | ||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 2/14/1941 | London, UK | 3/26/1941 | ||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 2/12/1941 | London, UK | 3/29/1941 | ||
Norway | Kokk | England | 11/1/1940 | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 6/10/1941 | |
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 11/20/1941 | Reykjavik, Island | 1/28/1942 | ||
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 10/24/1941 | Reykjavik, Island | 1/28/1942 | ||
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 9/25/1941 | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 10/4/1941 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Bristol, UK | 9/26/1941 | Reykjavik, Island | 1/28/1942 | |
Norway | Bristol, UK | 9/25/1941 | Barry, UK | 11/22/1941 | ||
Norway | Bristol, UK | 9/25/1941 | Manchester, UK | 12/12/1941 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Bergen, Norge | 2/11/1940 | Grimsby, UK | 8/15/1940 | |
Yugoslavia | Barry, UK | 10/4/1941 | Barry, UK | 10/21/1941 | ||
Finland | Alliert havn | Unknown | Alliert havn | 7/7/1941 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Alliert havn | 3/7/1941 | Alliert havn | 9/25/1941 | |
Norway | Alliert havn | 10/24/1940 | Alliert havn | 2/10/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Alliert havn | 8/15/1940 | Alliert havn | 10/21/1940 |