Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour 🠗1 | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 3/18/1940 | England | 10/30/1940 | ||
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 3/18/1940 | Grimsby, UK | 8/15/1940 | ||
Norway | Lemper / Fyrbøter | Haugesund, Norge | 3/18/1940 | London, UK | 10/20/1940 | |
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 3/18/1940 | Grimsby, UK | 8/15/1940 | ||
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 3/18/1940 | Reykjavik, Island | 1/15/1942 | ||
Norway | Lettmatros / Matros | Haugesund, Norge | 3/18/1940 | Oban, Skottland | 11/15/1940 | |
Norway | Haugesund, Norge | 12/18/1939 | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 8/22/1941 | ||
Norway | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 12/10/1941 | Glasgow, UK | 1/28/1942 | ||
Norway | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 11/13/1941 | Reykjavik, Island | 2/5/1942 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 10/11/1941 | Reykjavik, Island | 1/28/1942 | |
Norway | London, UK | 8/8/1942 | Forlist | 10/24/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 8/6/1942 | Forlist | 10/24/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 8/6/1942 | Forlist | 10/24/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 8/6/1942 | Forlist | 10/24/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 8/6/1942 | Forlist | 10/24/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 9/27/1941 | Reykjavik, Island | 1/15/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 8/25/1941 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 12/12/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 7/9/1941 | Bristol, UK | 9/25/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 7/8/1941 | Forlist | 1/28/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 7/8/1941 | Reykjavik, Island | 1/28/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 7/8/1941 | Bristol, UK | 9/25/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 7/8/1941 | Bristol, UK | 9/25/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 7/8/1941 | Bristol, UK | 9/25/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 4/28/1941 | London, UK | 7/7/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 4/22/1941 | Alliert havn | 4/28/1941 |