Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/1941 | Unknown | 7/10/1941 | |
Great Britain | Unknown | 5/30/1941 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Swansea, UK | 5/28/1941 | Glasgow, UK | 2/27/1942 | |
Norway | ukjent | Glasgow, UK | 5/28/1941 | Unknown | 11/12/1941 | |
Norway | Greenock, UK | 5/22/1941 | Greenock, UK | 2/26/1942 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Swansea, UK | 5/22/1941 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 6/12/1942 | |
Norway | Pumpemann | Swansea, UK | 5/22/1941 | Boston, UK | 5/5/1945 | |
Great Britain | Unknown | 5/21/1941 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Swansea, UK | 5/21/1941 | Greenock, UK | 2/26/1942 | ||
Great Britain | Lettmatros / Matros | Swansea, UK | 5/21/1941 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Ommønstring | 5/20/1941 | Greenock, UK | 2/26/1942 | ||
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 5/20/1941 | Swansea, UK | 8/16/1941 | ||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 5/20/1941 | Gourock, UK | 2/26/1942 | ||
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 5/20/1941 | Greenock, UK | 1/7/1943 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/19/1941 | Unknown | 9/8/1941 | ||
Great Britain | Glasgow, UK | 5/3/1941 | Gourock, UK | 8/29/1942 | ||
Norway | Freetown, Sierra Leone | 4/16/1941 | Swansea, UK | 8/13/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Freetown, Sierra Leone | 4/15/1941 | Swansea, UK | 5/21/1941 | |
Norway | Freetown, Sierra Leone | 4/15/1941 | Swansea, UK | 5/21/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/1941 | Unknown | 5/1941 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/1941 | Unknown | 2/26/1942 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/17/1941 | Unknown | 5/20/1941 | |
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Alliert havn | 3/3/1941 | Alliert havn | 4/15/1942 | |
Norway | Unknown | 1/1/1941 | Unknown | 1941 | ||
Norway | Smører / Motormann | Suez, Egypt | 12/31/1940 | Alliert havn | 2/25/1942 |