Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Norway | Passasjer | Sandefjord, Norge | 2/1/1939 | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 3/1/1939 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 12/4/1942 | Kristiansand, Norge | 12/9/1942 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 7/17/1941 | Kristiansand, Norge | 10/25/1941 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 8/1940 | Lysekil, Sverige | 6/8/1942 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 8/20/1940 | Narvik, Norge | 11/10/1940 | ||
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Om bord pr. | 11/13/1941 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 4/17/1958 | Oslo, Norge | 9/15/1959 | |
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 5/3/1957 | Oslo, Norge | 4/14/1958 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/10/1944 | Oslo, Norge | 4/19/1944 | ||
Norway | 4. Styrmann | Stavanger, Norge | 8/23/1943 | Oslo, Norge | 6/19/1944 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/10/1943 | Oslo, Norge | 5/24/1943 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/30/1942 | Oslo, Norge | 1943 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/30/1942 | Oslo, Norge | 6/6/1942 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/30/1942 | Oslo, Norge | 5/1942 | ||
Norway | Harstad, Norge | 9/23/1941 | Oslo, Norge | 3/29/1942 | ||
Norway | Harstad, Norge | 9/23/1941 | Oslo, Norge | 3/29/1942 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 8/16/1941 | Oslo, Norge | 2/21/1942 | ||
Norway | Drammen, Norge | 6/4/1941 | Oslo, Norge | 7/14/1941 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 5/30/1941 | Oslo, Norge | 8/14/1941 | ||
Norway | Stavanger, Norge | 1/14/1941 | Oslo, Norge | 2/6/1941 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 1/4/1941 | Oslo, Norge | 2/1/1941 | ||
Norway | Stavanger, Norge | 1/4/1941 | Oslo, Norge | 1/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 1/9/1940 | Oslo, Norge | 4/11/1940 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 8/23/1938 | Oslo, Norge | 8/21/1939 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 6/22/1936 | Oslo, Norge | 5/18/1937 |