Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 1944 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1934 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 4/17/1958 | Oslo, Norge | 9/15/1959 | |
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 5/3/1957 | Oslo, Norge | 4/14/1958 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/7/1956 | Unknown | 5/25/1956 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 12/19/1955 | Unknown | 4/25/1956 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/15/1951 | Unknown | 12/13/1951 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/25/1950 | Unknown | 6/19/1951 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 2/4/1950 | Unknown | 8/28/1950 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 7/16/1948 | Unknown | 3/23/1949 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 1/10/1948 | Unknown | 7/12/1948 | |
Norway | Unknown | 10/21/1946 | Unknown | 6/10/1947 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 10/22/1946 | Unknown | 5/5/1947 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Unknown | 10/21/1946 | Unknown | 5/5/1947 | |
Norway | Unknown | 10/22/1946 | Unknown | 4/25/1947 | ||
Norway | Kaptein | Unknown | 8/22/1944 | Unknown | 12/5/1945 | |
Norway | Sarpsborg, Norge | 2/9/1944 | Unknown | 4/30/1945 | ||
Norway | 4. Styrmann | Stavanger, Norge | 8/23/1943 | Oslo, Norge | 6/19/1944 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/10/1944 | Oslo, Norge | 4/19/1944 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 1943 | Sarpsborg, Norge | 2/9/1944 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/30/1942 | Oslo, Norge | 1943 | ||
Norway | Kaptein | Unknown | 9/16/1943 | Unknown | 12/2/1943 | |
Norway | Kaptein | Unknown | 5/25/1941 | Unknown | 5/26/1943 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/10/1943 | Oslo, Norge | 5/24/1943 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 1942 | Unknown | 1942 |