Seafarer | Nationality 🠗1 | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Arbeidsleder | Oslo, Norge | 8/25/1975 | Oslo, Norge | 11/18/1975 | |
Norway | Maskinassistent | Oslo, Norge | 1/20/1969 | Bangkok, Thailand | 3/27/1969 | |
Norway | Unknown | 8/16/1965 | Unknown | 12/28/1965 | ||
Norway | Smører / Motormann | Oslo, Norge | 2/27/1964 | Drammen, Norge | 2/26/1965 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 1/29/1962 | Unknown | 6/6/1962 | |
Norway | Unknown | 3/20/1961 | Unknown | 10/31/1962 |