Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Great Britain | New York, NY, USA | 11/18/1944 | New York, NY, USA | 4/30/1945 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 4/2/1941 | New York, NY, USA | 8/4/1941 | ||
Norway | San Pedro, CA, USA | 10/6/1941 | New York, NY, USA | 12/2/1941 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 4/10/1941 | New York, NY, USA | 9/23/1942 | ||
Norway | Tjener | New York, NY, USA | 8/17/1945 | New York, NY, USA | 9/30/1945 | |
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 12/22/1941 | New York, NY, USA | 6/5/1942 | ||
Norway | Kokk | New York, NY, USA | 9/14/1944 | New York, NY, USA | 12/11/1944 | |
Norway | Unknown | 8/26/1948 | Unknown | 2/27/1950 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 1/4/1944 | New York, NY, USA | 7/5/1944 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 7/16/1947 | Unknown | 3/22/1948 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 5/10/1945 | Alliert havn | 3/29/1946 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/29/1944 | Unknown | 11/25/1944 | |
Norway | Matros / Skytter | New York, NY, USA | 4/15/1944 | New York, NY, USA | 9/8/1944 | |
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 3/9/1954 | Oslo, Norge | 9/7/1954 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 5/11/1945 | New York, NY, USA | 10/28/1945 | ||
Denmark | New York, NY, USA | 1/6/1944 | New York, NY, USA | 3/29/1944 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 8/20/1945 | New York, NY, USA | 10/20/1945 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 3/26/1942 | New York, NY, USA | 9/18/1942 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 8/4/1941 | New York, NY, USA | 12/2/1941 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 10/21/1943 | New York, NY, USA | 6/26/1944 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | New York, NY, USA | 7/26/1945 | New York, NY, USA | 9/20/1945 | |
Norway | Matros / Skytter | New York, NY, USA | 5/22/1945 | New York, NY, USA | 11/16/1945 | |
Norway | Kokk | Unknown | 8/16/1939 | Unknown | 6/10/1940 | |
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 9/24/1942 | New York, NY, USA | 7/16/1943 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 2/24/1943 | New York, NY, USA | 5/10/1943 |