Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour 🠗1 | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 2/14/1939 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Lettmatros til Matros | Oslo, Norge | 3/15/1938 | Hull, Yorkshire, UK | 8/22/1940 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 10/1/1937 | Oslo, Norge | 8/29/1938 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 9/30/1937 | New York, NY, USA | 1/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Shanghai, Kina | 5/1/1941 | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 4/15/1942 | ||
Norway | Shanghai, Kina | 4/1941 | Cape Town, Sør-Afrika | 9/1942 | ||
Norway | Shanghai, Kina | 4/14/1941 | Hong Kong | 4/18/1941 | ||
Norway | Shanghai, Kina | 4/14/1941 | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 9/30/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Shanghai, Kina | 10/24/1940 | New York, NY, USA | 1/3/1941 | |
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Swansea, UK | 6/7/1943 | Omkom ved torpedering | 3/7/1944 | |
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Swansea, UK | 6/5/1943 | Unknown | 9/1/1943 | |
Norway | Swansea, UK | 6/3/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Swansea, UK | 6/1/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Swansea, UK | 5/31/1943 | Swansea, UK | 6/7/1943 | ||
Norway | Swansea, UK | 5/31/1943 | Beira, Mozambique | 11/18/1943 | ||
Norway | Swansea, UK | 5/31/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Australia | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/28/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Great Britain | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/28/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Australia | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/22/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/22/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/21/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/17/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/16/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 9/13/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 9/8/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 |