Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/21/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/17/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 12/16/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Australia | Maskingutt / Smører | Melbourne, Victoria, Australia | 12/13/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | |
Norway | Beira, Mozambique | 11/18/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Beira, Mozambique | 11/18/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Great Britain | 2. Telegrafist | Beira, Mozambique | 11/18/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | |
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Beira, Mozambique | 11/18/1943 | Omkom ved torpedering | 3/7/1944 | |
Sweden | Beira, Mozambique | 11/18/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 9/13/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 9/8/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | New York, NY, USA | 7/15/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | |
Norway | Matros / Skytter | New York, NY, USA | 7/4/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | |
Norway | Væpningsoffiser | Milford Haven, Wales, UK | 6/21/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | |
Norway | SSH inspeksjon og væpningsoffiser. | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 6/20/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | |
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 6/7/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Swansea, UK | 6/7/1943 | Omkom ved torpedering | 3/7/1944 | |
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 6/5/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 6/5/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Swansea, UK | 6/3/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 6/2/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Swansea, UK | 6/1/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 5/31/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 5/31/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 | ||
Norway | Swansea, UK | 5/31/1943 | Torpedert | 3/7/1944 |