Seafarer | Nationality 🠗1 | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Kristiansand, Norge | 6/8/1976 | Kristiansand, Norge | 7/12/1977 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 12/15/1971 | Trinidad | 2/7/1973 | ||
Norway | Overstyrmann | Lavera, Frankrike | 11/22/1970 | Pointe à Pierre, Trinidad and Tobago | 1/26/1972 | |
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Risør, Norge | 2/4/1970 | Teneriffe, Spania | 4/17/1971 | |
Norway | Unknown | 9/1/1969 | Unknown | 12/2/1969 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/29/1968 | Trieste, Italia | 9/19/1969 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 8/26/1963 | Sasebo, Japan | 4/11/1964 | ||
Norway | Fredrikstad, Norge | 10/23/1962 | Kuwait | 10/17/1964 | ||
Norway | Overstyrmann | Sarpsborg, Norge | 4/15/1966 | Ravenna, Italia | 4/22/1967 |