Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 8/21/1962 | Unknown | 5/14/1964 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/14/1960 | Unknown | 2/28/1962 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 7/22/1958 | Unknown | 12/23/1958 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/24/1958 | Unknown | 7/22/1958 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 12/20/1954 | Unknown | 2/15/1955 | ||
Norway | Sarpsborg, Norge | 3/13/1957 | Southampton, UK | 5/28/1958 | ||
Norway | Maskinassistent | Oslo, Norge | 7/23/1954 | Southampton, UK | 5/26/1955 | |
Norway | Malmø, Sverige | 8/7/1953 | Southampton, UK | 3/8/1953 | ||
Norway | Malmø, Sverige | 4/21/1953 | Southampton, UK | 3/8/1954 | ||
Norway | Port Said, Egypt | 3/17/1954 | Rotterdam, Holland | 9/19/1954 | ||
Norway | Kaptein | Southampton, UK | 3/8/1954 | Port Said, Egypt | 3/16/1954 | |
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 3/12/1954 | London, UK | 6/26/1957 | ||
Norway | Maskinassistent | Wilhelmshafen, Tyskland | 4/27/1962 | Genova, Italia | 8/29/1963 | |
Norway | Overstyrmann | Sarpsborg, Norge | 7/5/1965 | Amsterdam, Nederland | 1/17/1966 |